U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00609-1
  • Case Name: USA v. BROWN
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 14, 2022: [Status Report]
  • October 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney ]
  • October 10, 2022: [Substitute Attorney ]
  • October 10, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
September, 2022
  • September 01, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
August, 2022
  • August 12, 2022: [Transcript]
July, 2022
  • July 25, 2022: [Transcript]
  • July 22, 2022: [Status Report]
June, 2022
  • June 23, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
May, 2022
  • May 19, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
February, 2022
  • February 10, 2022: [Pretrial Memorandum]
January, 2022
  • January 29, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 11, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • January 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
December, 2021
  • December 27, 2021: [Protective Order ]
  • December 17, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 08, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • December 08, 2021: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • December 08, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 07, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 01, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
October, 2021
  • October 05, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 04, 2021: [.Order]
  • October 04, 2021: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.