U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00605-1
  • Case Name: USA v. WESTBURY et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 14, 2024: [Continue ]
September, 2022
  • September 13, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • September 01, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
August, 2022
  • August 15, 2022: [.Order]
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: [Reply to Opposition]
  • July 22, 2022: [Response to motion]
  • July 15, 2022: [Revoke]
  • July 06, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
June, 2022
  • June 01, 2022: [Response to (non-motion) Document]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 05, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
April, 2022
  • April 14, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 30, 2022: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • March 22, 2022: [Exclude]
  • March 22, 2022: [Continue ]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 25, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 24, 2022: [.Order]
  • February 24, 2022: [Status Report]
  • February 16, 2022: [Joinder]
  • February 13, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
January, 2022
  • January 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for Rule]
  • January 26, 2022: [Indictment]
  • January 18, 2022: [Rule]
  • January 10, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 05, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
December, 2021
  • December 28, 2021: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • December 22, 2021: [Order]
  • December 22, 2021: [Protective Order ]
  • December 03, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
November, 2021
  • November 01, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • November 01, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Stop]
  • October 29, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • October 29, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • October 28, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • October 27, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • October 27, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • October 27, 2021: [Strike ]
  • October 27, 2021: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel]
  • October 26, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 20, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 14, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 13, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 13, 2021: [Continue ]
  • October 12, 2021: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • October 12, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 12, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 12, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • October 12, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 12, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 12, 2021: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • October 12, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • October 12, 2021: [Speedy Trial ]
  • October 12, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • October 12, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 12, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 05, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
  • October 05, 2021: [Arrest - Other District ]
  • October 05, 2021: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.