U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00619-1
  • Case Name: USA v. HERRERA
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • January 20, 2023: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • January 17, 2023: [Statement of Reasons (DO NOT UNSEAL)]
  • January 17, 2023: [Judgment]
  • January 17, 2023: [Sentencing]
  • January 13, 2023: [Transcript]
  • January 13, 2023: [Response to Order of the Court]
  • January 04, 2023: [Reply to (non-motion) Document]
December, 2022
  • December 29, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • December 27, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 27, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
October, 2022
  • October 14, 2022: [Continue ]
August, 2022
  • August 19, 2022: [Verdict Form ]
  • August 19, 2022: [Signature of Foreperson..... (STAYS SEALED)]
  • August 19, 2022: [Jury Notes ]
  • August 19, 2022: [~Util- Jury Verdict]
  • August 19, 2022: [Referred for PSI Report]
  • August 18, 2022: [Attorneys' Acknowledgment of Trial Exhibits]
  • August 18, 2022: [Jury Instructions ]
  • August 17, 2022: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • August 16, 2022: [In Limine ]
  • August 15, 2022: [Minute Order for Jury Meals]
  • August 15, 2022: [Jury Trial]
  • August 12, 2022: [Exhibit List ]
  • August 10, 2022: [.Order]
  • August 05, 2022: [Order on Motion in Limine ]
  • August 05, 2022: [Pretrial Conference]
  • August 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Count(s)]
  • August 04, 2022: [Order on Motion for Change of Venue]
  • August 03, 2022: [Response to Order of the Court]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Permit]
  • July 28, 2022: [Response to Order of the Court]
  • July 25, 2022: [Permit]
  • July 15, 2022: [Pretrial Memorandum]
  • July 08, 2022: [Reply in Support]
  • July 05, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • July 05, 2022: [Order on Motion to Strike ]
  • July 01, 2022: [Strike ]
  • July 01, 2022: [Response to motion]
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • June 17, 2022: [Dismiss Count(s)]
  • June 17, 2022: [In Limine ]
  • June 17, 2022: [Change Venue]
  • June 13, 2022: [Continue ]
  • June 01, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
May, 2022
  • May 09, 2022: [Status Report]
  • May 05, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • April 26, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time ]
  • April 26, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 25, 2022: [Extension of Time to]
  • April 25, 2022: [Continue ]
  • April 25, 2022: [Exclude]
  • April 25, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 08, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • March 31, 2022: [.Order]
  • March 31, 2022: [Continue ]
  • March 31, 2022: [Exclude]
  • March 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • March 02, 2022: [Continue ]
  • March 02, 2022: [Exclude]
January, 2022
  • January 20, 2022: [Continue ]
December, 2021
  • December 14, 2021: [Rule 5 (c)(3) Documents Received]
  • December 10, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Exclude]
  • November 19, 2021: [Status Report]
  • November 18, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 18, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 18, 2021: [Continue ]
October, 2021
  • October 27, 2021: [Protective Order]
  • October 27, 2021: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • October 27, 2021: [Protective Order ]
  • October 27, 2021: [Status Report]
  • October 15, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • October 15, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 15, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • October 15, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 12, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 07, 2021: [Standing Order]
  • October 07, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 06, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.