U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00617-1
  • Case Name: USA v. YOUNG
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • January 24, 2023: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 23, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • January 23, 2023: [Continue ]
November, 2022
  • November 02, 2022: [Waiver of Trial by Jury]
  • November 02, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • November 02, 2022: [Statement of Offense]
  • November 02, 2022: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
  • November 02, 2022: [Referred for PSI Report]
April, 2022
  • April 19, 2022: [Show Cause Hearing]
February, 2022
  • February 25, 2022: [Strike ]
  • February 17, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 11, 2022: [Status Report]
November, 2021
  • November 08, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
October, 2021
  • October 26, 2021: [Order on Motion for Disclosure ]
  • October 26, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • October 26, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 26, 2021: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • October 26, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • October 26, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 26, 2021: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • October 26, 2021: [Disclosure ]
  • October 26, 2021: [Protective Order ]
  • October 25, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • October 21, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 07, 2021: [.Order]
  • October 07, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.