U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00615-1
  • Case Name: USA v. THURLOW
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 14, 2022: [.Order]
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Notice to Receiving District of Criminal Case Transfer]
  • September 27, 2022: [Transfer Out/Probationer]
  • September 26, 2022: [Statement of Reasons (DO NOT UNSEAL)]
  • September 26, 2022: [Judgment]
  • September 19, 2022: [Access]
  • September 15, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 01, 2022: [Sentencing]
August, 2022
  • August 19, 2022: [Supplement to any document]
  • August 19, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
July, 2022
  • July 21, 2022: [Pretrial Memorandum]
  • July 15, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • July 14, 2022: [Pretrial Memorandum]
  • July 14, 2022: [.Order]
May, 2022
  • May 09, 2022: [Statement of Offense]
  • May 09, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 09, 2022: [Referred for PSI Report]
  • May 09, 2022: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
April, 2022
  • April 20, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel]
  • April 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • April 13, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
  • April 13, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel]
March, 2022
  • March 04, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
February, 2022
  • February 24, 2022: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • February 24, 2022: [Exclude]
  • February 10, 2022: [Status Report]
January, 2022
  • January 25, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • January 06, 2022: [Rule 5 (c)(3) Documents Received]
November, 2021
  • November 04, 2021: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • November 04, 2021: [Order on Motion for Disclosure ]
  • November 04, 2021: [Disclosure ]
  • November 04, 2021: [Protective Order ]
October, 2021
  • October 19, 2021: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • October 19, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • October 19, 2021: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Stop]
  • October 19, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 15, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 08, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 07, 2021: [.Order]
  • October 07, 2021: [Notice of Corrected Docket Entry]
  • October 07, 2021: [Add Counts]
  • October 07, 2021: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.