U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00614-1
  • Case Name: USA v. COFFMAN
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 27, 2022: [Statement of Reasons (DO NOT UNSEAL)]
  • April 27, 2022: [Judgment]
  • April 06, 2022: [Sentencing]
March, 2022
  • March 02, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
February, 2022
  • February 25, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • February 25, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 25, 2022: [Continue ]
November, 2021
  • November 23, 2021: [Waiver of Trial by Jury]
  • November 23, 2021: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • November 23, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • November 17, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • November 17, 2021: [Referred for PSI Report]
  • November 17, 2021: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
  • November 17, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • November 17, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 12, 2021: [Add Counts]
October, 2021
  • October 07, 2021: [Rule 20 Transfer Notice-In]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.