U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00618-1
  • Case Name: USA v. WILLIAMS
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [Response to (non-motion) Document]
  • December 28, 2022: [Response to Order of the Court]
  • December 21, 2022: [Response to Order of the Court]
  • December 09, 2022: [Leave to File Denied]
  • December 08, 2022: [Verdict Form ]
  • December 08, 2022: [Signature of Foreperson..... (STAYS SEALED)]
  • December 08, 2022: [Jury Notes ]
  • December 08, 2022: [~Util- Jury Verdict]
  • December 08, 2022: [Referred for PSI Report]
  • December 06, 2022: [Dismissal of Counts on Government Motion]
  • December 05, 2022: [Dismiss Count(s)]
November, 2022
  • November 18, 2022: [Jury Deliberation]
  • November 17, 2022: [Signature of Foreperson..... (STAYS SEALED)]
  • November 17, 2022: [Jury Notes ]
  • November 17, 2022: [Jury Instructions ]
  • November 17, 2022: [Exhibit List ]
  • November 17, 2022: [Attorneys' Acknowledgment of Trial Exhibits]
  • November 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 15, 2022: [Trial Brief ]
  • November 14, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 14, 2022: [Proposed Jury Instructions ]
  • November 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Access]
  • November 14, 2022: [Response to Order of the Court]
  • November 10, 2022: [Order on Motion in Limine ]
  • November 10, 2022: [Access]
  • November 09, 2022: [Trial Brief ]
  • November 08, 2022: [Trial Brief ]
  • November 08, 2022: [Response to Order of the Court]
  • November 08, 2022: [Jury Trial]
  • November 08, 2022: [Minute Order for Jury Meals]
  • November 08, 2022: [Jury Selection - Do Not Use If Jurors Sworn/Trial Began]
  • November 07, 2022: [Response to Order of the Court]
  • November 06, 2022: [Response to Order of the Court]
  • November 06, 2022: [Exhibit List ]
  • November 06, 2022: [Witness List]
  • November 04, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • November 02, 2022: [Proposed Jury Instructions ]
  • November 02, 2022: [Response to Order of the Court]
  • November 01, 2022: [Order on Motion in Limine ]
  • November 01, 2022: [Response to (non-motion) Document]
  • November 01, 2022: [Response to Order of the Court]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Pretrial Conference]
  • October 21, 2022: [Statement of Case]
  • October 14, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 14, 2022: [Reply to (non-motion) Document]
  • October 14, 2022: [Reply in Support]
  • October 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Strike ]
  • October 11, 2022: [Order on Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal]
  • October 11, 2022: [Strike ]
  • October 07, 2022: [Response to motion]
  • October 07, 2022: [Response to (non-motion) Document]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Compel ]
  • September 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • September 26, 2022: [Withdraw Document]
  • September 23, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 23, 2022: [In Limine ]
  • September 19, 2022: [Compel]
  • September 14, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • September 13, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 19, 2022: [.Order]
  • August 19, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 17, 2022: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • August 17, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
  • August 15, 2022: [Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance by Assistant U.S. Attorney]
  • August 15, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • August 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Change of Venue]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • July 20, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
June, 2022
  • June 23, 2022: [Supplement to any document]
  • June 23, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • June 22, 2022: [Memorandum Opinion ]
  • June 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Count(s)]
  • June 16, 2022: [Reply in Support]
  • June 10, 2022: [Response to motion]
May, 2022
  • May 27, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • May 05, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel]
  • May 03, 2022: [Supplement to any document]
April, 2022
  • April 25, 2022: [Response to (non-motion) Document]
March, 2022
  • March 22, 2022: [Supplement to any document]
  • March 14, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
February, 2022
  • February 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Change of Venue]
  • February 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Count(s)]
  • February 18, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • February 18, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • February 10, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 08, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
January, 2022
  • January 24, 2022: [Reply in Support]
  • January 10, 2022: [Response to motion]
December, 2021
  • December 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • December 22, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • December 22, 2021: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • December 13, 2021: [Change Venue]
  • December 13, 2021: [Dismiss Count(s)]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [.Order]
  • November 29, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • November 19, 2021: [Dismiss Count(s)]
  • November 09, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
October, 2021
  • October 18, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 18, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • October 18, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • October 18, 2021: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • October 18, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 13, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 07, 2021: [.Order]
  • October 07, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 07, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.