U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00616-1
  • Case Name: USA v. SMITH
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 15, 2022: [Dismissal of Counts on Government Motion]
  • November 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Case]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Dismiss Case]
  • October 25, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 25, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 25, 2022: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • October 13, 2022: [Continue ]
September, 2022
  • September 21, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • September 21, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Exclude]
May, 2022
  • May 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • May 11, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 02, 2022: [Continue ]
February, 2022
  • February 16, 2022: [Rule 5 (c)(3) Documents Received]
  • February 10, 2022: [Status Report]
January, 2022
  • January 21, 2022: [Status Conference]
December, 2021
  • December 21, 2021: [Order on Motion for Disclosure ]
  • December 21, 2021: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • December 16, 2021: [Disclosure ]
November, 2021
  • November 19, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 19, 2021: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • November 09, 2021: [Status Report]
  • November 05, 2021: [Letter]
  • November 02, 2021: [.Order]
  • November 02, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 21, 2021: [Letter]
  • October 21, 2021: [Leave to File Denied]
  • October 20, 2021: [Exclude]
  • October 18, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • October 18, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 15, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 15, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 14, 2021: [Continue ]
  • October 14, 2021: [.Order]
  • October 14, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 07, 2021: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.