U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00612-1
  • Case Name: USA v. CHAMPION et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 09, 2023: [Referred for PSI Report]
  • January 04, 2023: [Statement of Reasons (DO NOT UNSEAL)]
  • January 04, 2023: [Judgment]
December, 2022
  • December 21, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • December 14, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • December 08, 2022: [.Order]
  • December 07, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Response to (non-motion) Document]
  • November 11, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • November 10, 2022: [Protective Order ]
October, 2022
  • October 13, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
September, 2022
  • September 15, 2022: [.Order]
  • September 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • September 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 08, 2022: [Exclude]
  • September 08, 2022: [Continue ]
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [Waiver of Trial by Jury]
  • August 26, 2022: [Statement of Offense]
  • August 26, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 26, 2022: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
  • August 26, 2022: [Referred for PSI Report]
  • August 16, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 10, 2022: [.Order]
  • August 10, 2022: [Waiver of Trial by Jury]
  • August 10, 2022: [Statement of Offense]
  • August 10, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 10, 2022: [Referred for PSI Report]
  • August 10, 2022: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
May, 2022
  • May 27, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
April, 2022
  • April 14, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
February, 2022
  • February 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • February 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • February 15, 2022: [Exclude]
  • February 15, 2022: [Continue ]
January, 2022
  • January 26, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
December, 2021
  • December 17, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 16, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
November, 2021
  • November 15, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 07, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 01, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • November 01, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
October, 2021
  • October 30, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 28, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 28, 2021: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • October 27, 2021: [Disclosure ]
  • October 27, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 27, 2021: [Protective Order ]
  • October 22, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • October 22, 2021: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • October 15, 2021: [Attorney Appearance Pro Bono]
  • October 15, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 15, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 14, 2021: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • October 14, 2021: [Order on Motion to Commit Defendant to Custody of Attorney General]
  • October 14, 2021: [Release from Custody ]
  • October 14, 2021: [Commit Defendant to Custody of Attorney General]
  • October 14, 2021: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • October 14, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • October 14, 2021: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • October 14, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 14, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 14, 2021: [Speedy Trial ]
  • October 13, 2021: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • October 13, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • October 13, 2021: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • October 13, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 13, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 13, 2021: [Speedy Trial ]
  • October 12, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • October 12, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 12, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • October 12, 2021: [Order on Motion for Temporary Detention]
  • October 12, 2021: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • October 12, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 12, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 12, 2021: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • October 12, 2021: [Temporary Detention ]
  • October 12, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • October 12, 2021: [Unseal Case]
  • October 11, 2021: [Temporary Detention ]
  • October 08, 2021: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • October 08, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • October 08, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.