U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00621-1
  • Case Name: USA v. SIZER
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 15, 2022: [Statement of Reasons (DO NOT UNSEAL)]
  • February 15, 2022: [Judgment]
  • February 01, 2022: [Sentencing]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Supplement to any document]
  • January 25, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • January 24, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 24, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
December, 2021
  • December 28, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 15, 2021: [Rule 5 (c)(3) Documents Received]
November, 2021
  • November 05, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 04, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 04, 2021: [Statement of Offense]
  • November 04, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • November 04, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • November 04, 2021: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
  • November 04, 2021: [Referred for PSI Report]
  • November 02, 2021: [.Order]
  • November 02, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
October, 2021
  • October 22, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 14, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 12, 2021: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • October 12, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 08, 2021: [Protective Order ]
  • October 08, 2021: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.