U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00586-1
  • Case Name: USA v. CONNOR et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 27, 2022: [Notice to Receiving District of Criminal Case Transfer]
  • December 27, 2022: [Transfer Out/Probationer]
November, 2022
  • November 23, 2022: [Notice to Receiving District of Criminal Case Transfer]
  • November 23, 2022: [Transfer Out/Probationer]
October, 2022
  • October 04, 2022: [Statement of Reasons (DO NOT UNSEAL)]
  • October 04, 2022: [Judgment]
September, 2022
  • September 21, 2022: [Statement of Reasons (DO NOT UNSEAL)]
  • September 21, 2022: [Judgment]
  • September 15, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • September 14, 2022: [Supplement to any document]
  • September 12, 2022: [.Order]
August, 2022
  • August 27, 2022: [Transcript]
  • August 26, 2022: [Withdraw Document]
  • August 25, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • August 24, 2022: [Notice of Error]
  • August 23, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • August 22, 2022: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • August 17, 2022: [Continue ]
May, 2022
  • May 02, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 02, 2022: [Statement of Offense]
  • May 02, 2022: [Referred for PSI Report]
  • May 02, 2022: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
  • May 02, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 07, 2022: [Exclude]
  • April 06, 2022: [Continue ]
March, 2022
  • March 11, 2022: [Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance by Assistant U.S. Attorney]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • February 10, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
January, 2022
  • January 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • January 18, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • January 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
  • January 13, 2022: [Vacate]
  • January 13, 2022: [Continue ]
  • January 13, 2022: [Exclude]
December, 2021
  • December 19, 2021: [Rule 5 (c)(3) Documents Received]
November, 2021
  • November 22, 2021: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Stop]
  • November 22, 2021: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • November 22, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • November 22, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • November 19, 2021: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • November 18, 2021: [Status Report]
  • November 18, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 18, 2021: [Protective Order ]
  • November 17, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
October, 2021
  • October 27, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 22, 2021: [.Order]
  • October 22, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • October 08, 2021: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.