U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00623-1
  • Case Name: USA v. ECKERMAN
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Minute Order for Jury Meals]
  • January 24, 2023: [Jury Trial]
  • January 22, 2023: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 19, 2023: [Exhibit List ]
  • January 19, 2023: [Proposed Verdict Form]
  • January 19, 2023: [Proposed Jury Instructions ]
  • January 18, 2023: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document ]
  • January 17, 2023: [Witness List]
  • January 17, 2023: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • January 17, 2023: [Leave to File Document ]
  • January 17, 2023: [Stipulation]
  • January 17, 2023: [Continue ]
  • January 12, 2023: [Supplement to any document]
  • January 12, 2023: [Response to (non-motion) Document]
  • January 11, 2023: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • January 11, 2023: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
  • January 09, 2023: [Statement of Case]
  • January 09, 2023: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • January 05, 2023: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear]
  • January 05, 2023: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 04, 2023: [Appear]
  • January 02, 2023: [Exhibit List ]
December, 2022
  • December 19, 2022: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • December 06, 2022: [Change Venue]
  • December 06, 2022: [In Limine ]
  • December 01, 2022: [Extension of Time to]
November, 2022
  • November 23, 2022: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • November 23, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • November 22, 2022: [Status Report]
  • November 08, 2022: [Waiver of Trial by Jury]
  • November 08, 2022: [Statement of Offense]
  • November 08, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • November 08, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • November 08, 2022: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
  • November 08, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 04, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 04, 2022: [Response to motion]
  • November 02, 2022: [Continue ]
October, 2022
  • October 26, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • October 12, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
  • October 12, 2022: [Exclude]
  • October 12, 2022: [Response to motion]
  • October 11, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • October 07, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 07, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • October 03, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [In Limine ]
  • September 30, 2022: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • September 29, 2022: [In Limine ]
  • September 28, 2022: [Suppress]
  • September 28, 2022: [Exclude]
  • September 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time ]
  • September 16, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • September 15, 2022: [Exclude]
  • September 15, 2022: [Extension of Time to]
  • September 02, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • September 01, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
  • September 01, 2022: [Exclude]
August, 2022
  • August 08, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • August 02, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel]
July, 2022
  • July 25, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 20, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 13, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
June, 2022
  • June 09, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 06, 2022: [Response to motion]
  • June 03, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • June 01, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • June 01, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • June 01, 2022: [Arraignment]
May, 2022
  • May 27, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 26, 2022: [.Order]
  • May 26, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
April, 2022
  • April 27, 2022: [Indictment]
  • April 12, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 11, 2022: [Continue ]
March, 2022
  • March 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 09, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 08, 2022: [Continue ]
February, 2022
  • February 10, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
January, 2022
  • January 06, 2022: [Status Conference]
November, 2021
  • November 06, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 01, 2021: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • November 01, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • November 01, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
October, 2021
  • October 21, 2021: [.Order]
  • October 21, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 12, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 08, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.