U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00622-2
  • Case Name: USA v. MATTICE et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
November, 2021
  • November 05, 2021: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
  • November 04, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 04, 2021: [Order]
  • November 01, 2021: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • November 01, 2021: [Notice of Corrected Docket Entry]
  • November 01, 2021: [Protective Order ]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Protective Order ]
  • October 28, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 27, 2021: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • October 27, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • October 27, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 27, 2021: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • October 27, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 27, 2021: [Speedy Trial ]
  • October 27, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • October 27, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 26, 2021: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • October 25, 2021: [.Order]
  • October 22, 2021: [Motion Hearing]
  • October 22, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 22, 2021: [Bond Set/Reset]
  • October 22, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 21, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document ]
  • October 21, 2021: [Reply in Support]
  • October 20, 2021: [Supplement to any document]
  • October 20, 2021: [Leave to File Document ]
  • October 20, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 20, 2021: [Response to motion]
  • October 19, 2021: [Rule 5 (c)(3) Documents Received]
  • October 19, 2021: [.Order]
  • October 19, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 19, 2021: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • October 18, 2021: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • October 18, 2021: [Stay]
  • October 18, 2021: [Review]
  • October 13, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
  • October 13, 2021: [Arrest - Other District ]
  • October 13, 2021: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.