U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00625-1
  • Case Name: USA v. ADAMS
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: [Order on Motion for Interim Payment]
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 22, 2025: [Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance by Assistant U.S. Attorney]
January, 2023
  • January 25, 2023: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • January 11, 2023: [Dismiss Case]
December, 2022
  • December 14, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 02, 2022: [Status Report]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
October, 2022
  • October 14, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
September, 2022
  • September 13, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
July, 2022
  • July 22, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 11, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • July 05, 2022: [.Order]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Indictment]
  • June 10, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
May, 2022
  • May 25, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 20, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • May 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • May 06, 2022: [Exclude]
  • May 05, 2022: [Continue ]
March, 2022
  • March 22, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 21, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 01, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
February, 2022
  • February 18, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 11, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
January, 2022
  • January 20, 2022: [Status Conference]
November, 2021
  • November 18, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
October, 2021
  • October 28, 2021: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • October 28, 2021: [Protective Order ]
  • October 20, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 20, 2021: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • October 20, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • October 20, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 14, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 13, 2021: [.Order]
  • October 13, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.