U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00626-1
  • Case Name: USA v. GUNBY
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: [.Order]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [USCA Mandate]
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [.Order]
  • January 23, 2023: [Memorandum Opinion ]
  • January 20, 2023: [Exclude]
  • January 20, 2023: [Status Report]
November, 2022
  • November 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • November 08, 2022: [Reply to Opposition]
  • November 03, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Response to motion]
  • October 28, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • October 07, 2022: [Dismiss Count(s)]
  • October 07, 2022: [Change Venue]
  • October 07, 2022: [Dismiss Case]
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • September 19, 2022: [Status Report]
  • September 09, 2022: [.Order]
  • September 07, 2022: [Status Report]
August, 2022
  • August 01, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 30, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • March 28, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
February, 2022
  • February 10, 2022: [Status Report]
January, 2022
  • January 25, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • January 24, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
December, 2021
  • December 16, 2021: [Order on Motion for Disclosure ]
  • December 16, 2021: [Disclosure ]
November, 2021
  • November 09, 2021: [Status Report]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Travel ]
  • October 28, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • October 28, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 28, 2021: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • October 28, 2021: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Stop]
  • October 28, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 28, 2021: [Travel ]
  • October 15, 2021: [.Order]
  • October 15, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 13, 2021: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.