U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00622-1
  • Case Name: USA v. GARDNER II
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Notice of Error]
  • January 23, 2023: [Continue ]
  • January 18, 2023: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Continue ]
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: [Waiver of Trial by Jury]
  • June 28, 2022: [Statement of Offense]
  • June 28, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • June 28, 2022: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
  • June 28, 2022: [Referred for PSI Report]
  • June 27, 2022: [Order directing action by Probation Office]
  • June 24, 2022: [Response to motion]
  • June 24, 2022: [Hold in Abeyance]
  • June 24, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time ]
  • June 23, 2022: [Extension of Time to]
  • June 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document ]
  • June 17, 2022: [Extension of Time to]
  • June 17, 2022: [Leave to File Document ]
  • June 10, 2022: [.Order]
  • June 09, 2022: [Extension of Time to]
  • June 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time ]
  • June 02, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • June 01, 2022: [Extension of Time to]
May, 2022
  • May 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Strike ]
  • May 13, 2022: [.Order]
  • May 13, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 09, 2022: [Strike ]
February, 2022
  • February 17, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • February 11, 2022: [Rule 5 (c)(3) Documents Received]
  • February 10, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
December, 2021
  • December 17, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • December 17, 2021: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • December 17, 2021: [Exclude]
  • December 17, 2021: [Continue ]
November, 2021
  • November 05, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
October, 2021
  • October 28, 2021: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • October 27, 2021: [Protective Order ]
  • October 25, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 20, 2021: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • October 19, 2021: [Order]
  • October 19, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 19, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • October 19, 2021: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • October 19, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 14, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 13, 2021: [.Order]
  • October 13, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.