U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00627-1
  • Case Name: USA v. WATROUS
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 13, 2022: [Probation Order]
June, 2022
  • June 01, 2022: [Transcript]
April, 2022
  • April 21, 2022: [Statement of Reasons (DO NOT UNSEAL)]
  • April 21, 2022: [Judgment]
  • April 21, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • April 11, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 07, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
February, 2022
  • February 15, 2022: [Status Report]
January, 2022
  • January 14, 2022: [Waiver of Trial by Jury]
  • January 14, 2022: [Statement of Offense]
  • January 14, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 14, 2022: [Submission to the Court in Preparation for Upcoming Plea Hearing]
  • January 14, 2022: [Referred for PSI Report]
  • January 14, 2022: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
  • January 14, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • January 11, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 07, 2022: [.Order]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • November 12, 2021: [Status Report]
October, 2021
  • October 25, 2021: [Status Report]
  • October 22, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • October 22, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • October 22, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 20, 2021: [Protective Order]
  • October 20, 2021: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • October 20, 2021: [Protective Order ]
  • October 19, 2021: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • October 18, 2021: [Order]
  • October 18, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 15, 2021: [Standing Order]
  • October 15, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 15, 2021: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.