U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00630-1
  • Case Name: USA v. METEER
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 01, 2022: [Notice to Receiving District of Criminal Case Transfer]
  • June 01, 2022: [Transfer Out/Probationer]
April, 2022
  • April 27, 2022: [Statement of Reasons (DO NOT UNSEAL)]
  • April 27, 2022: [Judgment]
  • April 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Count(s)]
  • April 22, 2022: [Dismiss Count(s)]
  • April 21, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • April 15, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
February, 2022
  • February 11, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
January, 2022
  • January 13, 2022: [Statement of Offense]
  • January 13, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 13, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • January 13, 2022: [Referred for PSI Report]
  • January 13, 2022: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
  • January 13, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
November, 2021
  • November 08, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
October, 2021
  • October 26, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • October 26, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • October 26, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 26, 2021: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • October 26, 2021: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Stop]
  • October 26, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 25, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 20, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 20, 2021: [.Order]
  • October 15, 2021: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.