U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00629-1
  • Case Name: USA v. COMEAU
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 27, 2022: [Notice to Receiving District of Criminal Case Transfer]
  • December 27, 2022: [Transfer Out/Probationer]
November, 2022
  • November 18, 2022: [Statement of Reasons (DO NOT UNSEAL)]
  • November 18, 2022: [Judgment]
  • November 16, 2022: [Sentencing]
October, 2022
  • October 19, 2022: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
April, 2022
  • April 09, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
March, 2022
  • March 24, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 24, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • March 22, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 21, 2022: [Continue ]
February, 2022
  • February 11, 2022: [Status Report]
December, 2021
  • December 21, 2021: [Waiver of Trial by Jury]
  • December 21, 2021: [Statement of Offense]
  • December 21, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • December 21, 2021: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
  • December 21, 2021: [Referred for PSI Report]
  • December 21, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
November, 2021
  • November 17, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • November 08, 2021: [Status Report]
  • November 05, 2021: [Rule 5 (c)(3) Documents Received]
  • November 01, 2021: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • November 01, 2021: [Order on Motion for Disclosure ]
October, 2021
  • October 28, 2021: [Protective Order ]
  • October 28, 2021: [Disclosure ]
  • October 25, 2021: [Standing Order]
  • October 22, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 22, 2021: [Status Report]
  • October 22, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 22, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 21, 2021: [.Order]
  • October 21, 2021: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • October 21, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 21, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 21, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • October 21, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • October 21, 2021: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • October 21, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 21, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 21, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • October 21, 2021: [Speedy Trial ]
  • October 15, 2021: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.