U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00628-1
  • Case Name: USA v. RILEY
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 05, 2023: [Transcript]
December, 2022
  • December 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Count(s)]
  • December 21, 2022: [Dismiss Count(s)]
  • December 19, 2022: [Referred for PSI Report]
  • December 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for New Trial ]
  • December 09, 2022: [Reply to Opposition]
  • December 09, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • December 02, 2022: [Memorandum in Opposition]
November, 2022
  • November 18, 2022: [New Trial ]
  • November 15, 2022: [Reply to (non-motion) Document]
  • November 10, 2022: [Response to (non-motion) Document]
  • November 09, 2022: [Response to Order of the Court]
  • November 08, 2022: [Extension of Time to]
  • November 04, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 01, 2022: [Jury Instructions ]
  • November 01, 2022: [Attorneys' Acknowledgment of Trial Exhibits]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Exhibit List ]
  • October 31, 2022: [Verdict Form ]
  • October 31, 2022: [Signature of Foreperson..... (STAYS SEALED)]
  • October 31, 2022: [Jury Notes ]
  • October 31, 2022: [~Util- Jury Verdict]
  • October 31, 2022: [Deferred of PSI Report]
  • October 28, 2022: [Response to Order of the Court]
  • October 28, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 27, 2022: [Signature of Foreperson..... (STAYS SEALED)]
  • October 27, 2022: [Jury Notes ]
  • October 26, 2022: [Signature of Foreperson..... (STAYS SEALED)]
  • October 26, 2022: [Jury Notes ]
  • October 21, 2022: [Proposed Jury Instructions ]
  • October 18, 2022: [Jury Trial]
  • October 18, 2022: [Minute Order for Jury Meals]
  • October 17, 2022: [Jury Selection - Do Not Use If Jurors Sworn/Trial Began]
  • October 15, 2022: [.Order]
  • October 13, 2022: [Supplement to any document]
  • October 12, 2022: [Proposed Jury Instructions ]
  • October 12, 2022: [Exhibit List ]
  • October 11, 2022: [Stipulation]
  • October 09, 2022: [Transcript]
  • October 06, 2022: [Response to (non-motion) Document]
  • October 05, 2022: [Exhibit List ]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Stipulation]
  • September 29, 2022: [Exhibit List ]
  • September 29, 2022: [Supplement to any document]
  • September 22, 2022: [Pretrial Memorandum]
  • September 22, 2022: [Response to Order of the Court]
  • September 13, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 13, 2022: [Response to (non-motion) Document]
  • September 13, 2022: [Pretrial Conference]
  • September 11, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 01, 2022: [Pretrial Memorandum]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 22, 2022: [Reply to Opposition]
  • August 15, 2022: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • August 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 04, 2022: [Exclude]
  • August 03, 2022: [Continue ]
  • August 01, 2022: [In Limine ]
July, 2022
  • July 20, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Case]
  • June 06, 2022: [Reply to Opposition]
May, 2022
  • May 30, 2022: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • May 16, 2022: [Dismiss Case]
  • May 02, 2022: [.Order]
  • May 02, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • May 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Compel ]
April, 2022
  • April 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time ]
  • April 01, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 30, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 28, 2022: [Extension of Time to]
February, 2022
  • February 24, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • February 03, 2022: [Reply to Opposition]
January, 2022
  • January 27, 2022: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • January 18, 2022: [Transcript]
  • January 13, 2022: [Compel]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [.Order]
October, 2021
  • October 27, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 26, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • October 26, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 20, 2021: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • October 20, 2021: [Order on Motion for Disclosure ]
  • October 20, 2021: [Notice of Corrected Docket Entry]
  • October 20, 2021: [Disclosure ]
  • October 19, 2021: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • October 19, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 19, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • October 19, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • October 19, 2021: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • October 19, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 19, 2021: [Protective Order ]
  • October 18, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 15, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 15, 2021: [Errata]
  • October 15, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • October 15, 2021: [.Order]
  • October 15, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 15, 2021: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • October 15, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 15, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 15, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • October 15, 2021: [Release from Custody ]
  • October 15, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
  • October 15, 2021: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • October 15, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal Case]
  • October 15, 2021: [Seal Case]
  • October 15, 2021: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.