U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00620-1
  • Case Name: USA v. NEELY
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2021
  • October 25, 2021: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
  • October 21, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 20, 2021: [.Order]
  • October 20, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • October 20, 2021: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • October 20, 2021: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • October 20, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 20, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 20, 2021: [Speedy Trial ]
  • October 20, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • October 19, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • October 19, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 18, 2021: [.Order]
  • October 18, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • October 18, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
  • October 18, 2021: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.