U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00631-1
  • Case Name: USA v. MESSER et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Stop]
  • November 29, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 29, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 28, 2022: [Continue ]
  • November 28, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
October, 2022
  • October 26, 2022: [Continue ]
September, 2022
  • September 13, 2022: [Continue ]
  • September 13, 2022: [Exclude]
July, 2022
  • July 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • July 07, 2022: [Exclude]
  • July 06, 2022: [Continue ]
  • July 05, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
June, 2022
  • June 22, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel]
May, 2022
  • May 17, 2022: [.Order]
  • May 16, 2022: [Continue ]
March, 2022
  • March 19, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • March 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 18, 2022: [Continue ]
  • March 18, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
January, 2022
  • January 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • January 14, 2022: [Notice of Corrected Docket Entry]
  • January 14, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • January 11, 2022: [Status Conference]
November, 2021
  • November 04, 2021: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • November 04, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • November 04, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 04, 2021: [Arraignment]
October, 2021
  • October 20, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 18, 2021: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.