U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00618-1
  • Case Name: USA v. GRANT
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 20, 2021: [.Order]
  • December 20, 2021: [Protective Order]
  • December 17, 2021: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
  • December 16, 2021: [Order on Motion for Disclosure ]
  • December 16, 2021: [Protective Order ]
  • December 15, 2021: [Disclosure ]
  • December 15, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 15, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • December 15, 2021: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • December 14, 2021: [Exclude]
  • December 14, 2021: [Notice of Corrected Docket Entry]
  • December 14, 2021: [Continue ]
October, 2021
  • October 22, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 21, 2021: [.Order]
  • October 21, 2021: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • October 21, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 21, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 21, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 21, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • October 21, 2021: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • October 21, 2021: [Speedy Trial ]
  • October 21, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • October 19, 2021: [Rule 5 (c)(3) Documents Received]
  • October 18, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
  • October 18, 2021: [Arrest - Other District ]
  • October 18, 2021: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.