U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00624-1
  • Case Name: USA v. ELLIOTT
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Notice to Receiving District of Criminal Case Transfer]
  • August 29, 2022: [Transfer Out/Supervised]
  • August 01, 2022: [Probation Order]
February, 2022
  • February 01, 2022: [Statement of Reasons (DO NOT UNSEAL)]
  • February 01, 2022: [Judgment]
January, 2022
  • January 20, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 20, 2022: [Statement of Offense]
  • January 20, 2022: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • January 20, 2022: [Waiver of Trial by Jury]
  • January 20, 2022: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
  • January 20, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • January 12, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
October, 2021
  • October 25, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • October 25, 2021: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • October 25, 2021: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Stop]
  • October 25, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 25, 2021: [Referred for PSI Report]
  • October 25, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 25, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • October 20, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 19, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 19, 2021: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.