U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00613-1
  • Case Name: USA v. CHANG
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 02, 2021: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
  • December 01, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Protective Order]
  • November 28, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 22, 2021: [Order on Motion for Disclosure ]
  • November 22, 2021: [Protective Order ]
  • November 22, 2021: [Disclosure ]
  • November 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • November 22, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 19, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • November 18, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 12, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • November 08, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
October, 2021
  • October 27, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 26, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 26, 2021: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • October 26, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 26, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 26, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 26, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • October 26, 2021: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • October 26, 2021: [Speedy Trial ]
  • October 26, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • October 26, 2021: [.Order]
  • October 25, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 19, 2021: [Arrest - Other District ]
  • October 19, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
  • October 19, 2021: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.