U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00610-1
  • Case Name: USA v. RAFARACI
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify]
  • December 06, 2022: [Modify]
November, 2022
  • November 18, 2022: [Status Report]
  • November 17, 2022: [Continue ]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • August 22, 2022: [Continue ]
  • August 19, 2022: [Status Report]
April, 2022
  • April 22, 2022: [Order Modifying Conditions of Release]
  • April 22, 2022: [Statement of Offense]
  • April 22, 2022: [Waiver of Trial by Jury]
  • April 22, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 22, 2022: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
  • April 22, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 13, 2022: [Notice of Provisional/Government Not Certified Status]
  • April 12, 2022: [Continue ]
  • April 12, 2022: [Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance by Assistant U.S. Attorney]
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: [Order on Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal]
  • March 29, 2022: [Redacted Document]
  • March 28, 2022: [Order to Seal Document]
  • March 25, 2022: [Notice of Filing Redacted Document]
  • March 24, 2022: [Order on Motion to Strike ]
  • March 23, 2022: [Strike ]
  • March 04, 2022: [Continue ]
January, 2022
  • January 24, 2022: [Continue ]
  • January 24, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
December, 2021
  • December 23, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 23, 2021: [Travel ]
  • December 23, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • December 21, 2021: [.Order]
  • December 21, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • December 20, 2021: [Modify Conditions of Release]
November, 2021
  • November 23, 2021: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • November 23, 2021: [Protective Order ]
  • November 01, 2021: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • November 01, 2021: [Protective Order ]
October, 2021
  • October 28, 2021: [Exclude]
  • October 27, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 27, 2021: [Continue ]
  • October 26, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 25, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 22, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • October 22, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 22, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 21, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 19, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 19, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • October 19, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 19, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
  • October 19, 2021: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • October 19, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 19, 2021: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • October 19, 2021: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • October 19, 2021: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • October 19, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 19, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • October 19, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 19, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 19, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • October 19, 2021: [Speedy Trial ]
  • October 19, 2021: [Release from Custody ]
  • October 19, 2021: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.