U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00635-1
  • Case Name: USA v. TINGWEI
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 12, 2023: [Order on Motion for Waiver]
  • January 12, 2023: [Order on Motion to Compel ]
  • January 03, 2023: [Reply to (non-motion) Document]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • November 18, 2022: [Notice of Error]
  • November 18, 2022: [Response to motion]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Compel]
  • September 28, 2022: [Waiver]
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • August 25, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • August 16, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • August 15, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • August 08, 2022: [Vacate (2255)]
July, 2022
  • July 15, 2022: [Statement of Reasons (DO NOT UNSEAL)]
  • July 15, 2022: [Judgment]
  • July 15, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • July 05, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
June, 2022
  • June 15, 2022: [Continue ]
May, 2022
  • May 05, 2022: [Hearing ]
  • May 05, 2022: [Vacate]
  • May 05, 2022: [Continue ]
April, 2022
  • April 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • April 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Travel ]
  • April 25, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • April 25, 2022: [Travel ]
  • April 04, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • April 04, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 04, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Stop]
March, 2022
  • March 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 18, 2022: [Status Report]
  • March 17, 2022: [Notice of Corrected Docket Entry]
  • March 17, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 04, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 04, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • March 04, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
February, 2022
  • February 13, 2022: [Response to motion]
  • February 09, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
January, 2022
  • January 11, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 10, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • January 07, 2022: [Continue ]
November, 2021
  • November 22, 2021: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • November 22, 2021: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • November 22, 2021: [Waiver of Trial by Jury]
  • November 19, 2021: [Statement of Offense]
  • November 19, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • November 19, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • November 19, 2021: [Referred for PSI Report]
  • November 19, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • November 19, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
October, 2021
  • October 28, 2021: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • October 25, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 24, 2021: [Exclude]
  • October 22, 2021: [.Order]
  • October 22, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • October 19, 2021: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.