U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00632-1
  • Case Name: USA v. TIPTON
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 16, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
November, 2022
  • November 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2022
  • October 19, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 12, 2022: [Waiver of Trial by Jury]
  • October 12, 2022: [Statement of Offense]
  • October 12, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 12, 2022: [Referred for PSI Report]
  • October 12, 2022: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
  • October 12, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
August, 2022
  • August 24, 2022: [Status Report]
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: [Status Report]
May, 2022
  • May 16, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • May 13, 2022: [Status Report]
January, 2022
  • January 24, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
December, 2021
  • December 14, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • December 14, 2021: [Exclude]
  • December 13, 2021: [Continue ]
November, 2021
  • November 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • November 22, 2021: [Exclude]
  • November 12, 2021: [.Order]
  • November 12, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 09, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • November 09, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • November 09, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 02, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
October, 2021
  • October 27, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 20, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.