U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00633-1
  • Case Name: USA v. O'BRIEN
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 14, 2022: [Statement of Reasons (DO NOT UNSEAL)]
  • April 14, 2022: [Judgment]
  • April 06, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • April 05, 2022: [Response to (non-motion) Document]
March, 2022
  • March 29, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 29, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
February, 2022
  • February 10, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
January, 2022
  • January 13, 2022: [Waiver of Trial by Jury]
  • January 06, 2022: [Statement of Offense]
  • January 06, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 05, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • January 05, 2022: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
  • January 05, 2022: [Referred for PSI Report]
December, 2021
  • December 23, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 14, 2021: [Rule 5 (c)(3) Documents Received]
November, 2021
  • November 05, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • October 29, 2021: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • October 25, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 21, 2021: [.Order]
  • October 21, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 21, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 20, 2021: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.