U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00634-1
  • Case Name: USA v. MARSHALL
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Judgment]
  • July 27, 2022: [Verdict Form ]
  • July 27, 2022: [Jury Notes ]
  • July 27, 2022: [Signature of Foreperson..... (STAYS SEALED)]
  • July 27, 2022: [Jury Deliberation]
  • July 27, 2022: [~Util- Jury Verdict]
  • July 26, 2022: [Attorneys' Acknowledgment of Trial Exhibits]
  • July 26, 2022: [Exhibit List ]
  • July 25, 2022: [Jury Trial]
  • July 25, 2022: [Minute Order for Jury Meals]
  • July 24, 2022: [Supplement to any document]
  • July 24, 2022: [In Limine ]
  • July 22, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 21, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 20, 2022: [.Order]
  • July 15, 2022: [Transcript]
  • July 15, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 08, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • July 08, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 06, 2022: [Reply in Support]
  • July 06, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • July 05, 2022: [Supplement to any document]
  • July 05, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 05, 2022: [Notice of Courtroom Change]
  • July 01, 2022: [Response to (non-motion) Document]
  • July 01, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • June 28, 2022: [Reply to Opposition]
  • June 28, 2022: [Response to (non-motion) Document]
  • June 28, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 28, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • June 24, 2022: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • June 23, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 22, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 21, 2022: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • June 17, 2022: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • June 09, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 09, 2022: [Notice of Error]
  • June 06, 2022: [Suppress]
  • June 06, 2022: [In Limine ]
  • June 06, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 02, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
May, 2022
  • May 26, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 17, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • May 16, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel]
March, 2022
  • March 10, 2022: [Status Report]
February, 2022
  • February 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Review]
January, 2022
  • January 25, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 20, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • January 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • January 19, 2022: [Review]
  • January 18, 2022: [Protective Order ]
December, 2021
  • December 21, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 01, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
November, 2021
  • November 10, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 01, 2021: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • November 01, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 01, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
October, 2021
  • October 27, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • October 27, 2021: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • October 26, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 21, 2021: [Order on Motion to Commit Defendant to Custody of Attorney General]
  • October 21, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 21, 2021: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • October 21, 2021: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • October 21, 2021: [Speedy Trial ]
  • October 21, 2021: [Release from Custody ]
  • October 21, 2021: [Commit Defendant to Custody of Attorney General]
  • October 21, 2021: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • October 20, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 20, 2021: [.Order]
  • October 20, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • October 20, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 20, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 20, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 20, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • October 20, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.