U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00630-1
  • Case Name: USA v. MITCHELL
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 09, 2021: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
November, 2021
  • November 05, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 01, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Indict]
  • November 01, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 01, 2021: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • November 01, 2021: [Exclude]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Extension of Time to Indict]
  • October 29, 2021: [Protective Order]
  • October 28, 2021: [Order on Motion for Disclosure ]
  • October 28, 2021: [Protective Order]
  • October 27, 2021: [Disclosure ]
  • October 27, 2021: [Order]
  • October 27, 2021: [Protective Order ]
  • October 27, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 21, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions for High Intensity Supervision Program]
  • October 21, 2021: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • October 21, 2021: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • October 21, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 21, 2021: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • October 21, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 21, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 21, 2021: [Speedy Trial ]
  • October 21, 2021: [Release from Custody ]
  • October 20, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
  • October 20, 2021: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • October 20, 2021: [Arrest - Other District ]
  • October 20, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal Case]
  • October 20, 2021: [Seal Case]
  • October 20, 2021: [Complaint (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.