U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mc-00129
  • Case Name: IN RE SUBPOENA ISSUED TO WILLIAM D. SAMMON
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
November, 2021
  • November 04, 2021: [Receipt and Acknowledgment of Transfer Papers]
  • November 03, 2021: [Case Transferred Out]
October, 2021
  • October 26, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • October 25, 2021: [Notice of QC]
  • October 24, 2021: [Order on Motion for TRO]
  • October 24, 2021: [Order on Motion to Quash]
  • October 24, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 22, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • October 22, 2021: [Memorandum in opposition to motion]
  • October 20, 2021: [LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests]
  • October 20, 2021: [Temporary Restraining Order]
  • October 20, 2021: [Motion to Quash]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.