U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mc-00130
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. MADRID-FLORES
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 23, 2021: [Transcript]
November, 2021
  • November 05, 2021: [Rule 5 (c)(3) Documents Received]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [.Order]
  • October 28, 2021: [Motion Hearing]
  • October 27, 2021: [Supplemental Memorandum]
  • October 27, 2021: [Reply to opposition to motion]
  • October 26, 2021: [Order on Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal]
  • October 26, 2021: [Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal]
  • October 26, 2021: [Memorandum in opposition to motion]
  • October 25, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • October 25, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • October 22, 2021: [.Order]
  • October 22, 2021: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • October 21, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 21, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.