U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00639-1
  • Case Name: USA v. SARGENT
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 13, 2023: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 11, 2023: [Continue ]
  • January 05, 2023: [Continue ]
November, 2022
  • November 15, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 10, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
October, 2022
  • October 19, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 18, 2022: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
June, 2022
  • June 15, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
April, 2022
  • April 22, 2022: [Indictment]
  • April 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 20, 2022: [Continue ]
February, 2022
  • February 25, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Order on Motion for Disclosure ]
  • November 30, 2021: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • November 29, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • November 29, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • November 29, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • November 29, 2021: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • November 29, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 29, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 28, 2021: [Disclosure ]
  • November 28, 2021: [Protective Order ]
October, 2021
  • October 28, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 27, 2021: [.Order]
  • October 25, 2021: [Standing Order]
  • October 22, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.