U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00642-1
  • Case Name: USA v. NEELY
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 05, 2023: [Memorandum in Opposition]
December, 2022
  • December 14, 2022: [Change Venue]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • November 28, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
October, 2022
  • October 25, 2022: [.Order]
  • October 17, 2022: [Indictment]
September, 2022
  • September 13, 2022: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • September 08, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 07, 2022: [Order on Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal]
  • September 07, 2022: [Revoke]
  • September 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Revoke]
  • September 06, 2022: [Response to motion]
  • September 02, 2022: [Revoke]
  • September 02, 2022: [In Limine ]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • August 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • August 29, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • August 22, 2022: [Response to motion]
  • August 22, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • August 21, 2022: [Response to motion]
  • August 08, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 08, 2022: [In Limine ]
  • August 08, 2022: [Dismiss Case]
  • August 08, 2022: [Dismiss Count(s)]
  • August 08, 2022: [Compel]
  • August 08, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 08, 2022: [Change Venue]
  • August 08, 2022: [Suppress]
July, 2022
  • July 11, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
June, 2022
  • June 21, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
May, 2022
  • May 07, 2022: [Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance by Assistant U.S. Attorney]
April, 2022
  • April 13, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
February, 2022
  • February 17, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • February 14, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
January, 2022
  • January 10, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • January 09, 2022: [Continue ]
December, 2021
  • December 21, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • November 22, 2021: [Order on Motion for Disclosure ]
  • November 13, 2021: [.Order]
  • November 13, 2021: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • November 12, 2021: [Disclosure ]
  • November 12, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • November 12, 2021: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • November 12, 2021: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Stop]
  • November 12, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • November 12, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 11, 2021: [Protective Order ]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 25, 2021: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.