U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00637-1
  • Case Name: USA v. BRANNAN
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 01, 2022: [.Order]
October, 2022
  • October 06, 2022: [Statement of Reasons (DO NOT UNSEAL)]
  • October 06, 2022: [Judgment]
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • September 16, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • September 14, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
June, 2022
  • June 13, 2022: [Waiver of Trial by Jury]
  • June 13, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • June 13, 2022: [Statement of Offense]
  • June 13, 2022: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
  • June 13, 2022: [Referred for PSI Report]
  • June 13, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
May, 2022
  • May 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • May 05, 2022: [Continue ]
April, 2022
  • April 20, 2022: [.Order]
  • April 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • April 14, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
February, 2022
  • February 10, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
January, 2022
  • January 06, 2022: [Status Conference]
December, 2021
  • December 03, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
November, 2021
  • November 17, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • November 01, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • November 01, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • November 01, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 01, 2021: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Stop]
  • November 01, 2021: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • November 01, 2021: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Protective Order ]
  • October 26, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 25, 2021: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.