U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00640-1
  • Case Name: USA v. TENNEY et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 11, 2023: [Transcript]
December, 2022
  • December 09, 2022: [Statement of Reasons (DO NOT UNSEAL)]
  • December 09, 2022: [Judgment]
  • December 06, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • December 02, 2022: [Response to (non-motion) Document]
  • December 02, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
  • November 28, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • November 27, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • November 18, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
  • November 17, 2022: [Objection to Report and Recommendations]
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Judgment]
  • September 26, 2022: [Statement of Reasons (DO NOT UNSEAL)]
  • September 13, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 09, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • September 08, 2022: [Continue ]
  • September 01, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
August, 2022
  • August 24, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • August 16, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 15, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
  • August 15, 2022: [Continue ]
  • August 14, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 14, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Waiver of Trial by Jury]
  • June 30, 2022: [Statement of Offense]
  • June 30, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • June 30, 2022: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
  • June 30, 2022: [Referred for PSI Report]
  • June 21, 2022: [Statement of Facts in Support of Plea Agreement ]
  • June 21, 2022: [Statement of Offense]
May, 2022
  • May 11, 2022: [Transcript]
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: [Statement of Offense]
  • March 30, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 30, 2022: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
  • March 30, 2022: [Referred for PSI Report]
  • March 21, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 03, 2022: [Exclude]
  • March 01, 2022: [Continue ]
February, 2022
  • February 11, 2022: [Status Report]
  • February 11, 2022: [Rule 5 (c)(3) Documents Received]
January, 2022
  • January 18, 2022: [Rule 5 (c)(3) Documents Received]
  • January 12, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 12, 2022: [Status Conference]
November, 2021
  • November 15, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • November 15, 2021: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • November 15, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • November 15, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 09, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 08, 2021: [Status Report]
  • November 02, 2021: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • November 02, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
October, 2021
  • October 27, 2021: [Exclude]
  • October 27, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 26, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • October 26, 2021: [.Order]
  • October 25, 2021: [Status Report]
  • October 25, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.