U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00636-1
  • Case Name: USA v. LUO
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Supplemental Record Sent USCA]
  • March 28, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • March 27, 2025: [Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • March 27, 2025: [USCA Order]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
February, 2025
  • February 25, 2025: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • October 11, 2024: [Downward Departure]
  • October 10, 2024: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • November 29, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
November, 2021
  • November 08, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions for High Intensity Supervision Program]
  • November 05, 2021: [Waiver of Trial by Jury]
  • November 05, 2021: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • November 04, 2021: [Statement of Offense]
  • November 04, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • November 04, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • November 04, 2021: [Deferred of PSI Report]
  • November 04, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • November 04, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
October, 2021
  • October 26, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 26, 2021: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • October 26, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 25, 2021: [Exclude]
  • October 25, 2021: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.