U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00641-1
  • Case Name: USA v. MEONI
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 13, 2022: [Statement of Reasons (DO NOT UNSEAL)]
  • December 13, 2022: [Judgment]
November, 2022
  • November 16, 2022: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • November 16, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • November 14, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
October, 2022
  • October 20, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 17, 2022: [Continue ]
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • September 25, 2022: [Continue ]
  • September 25, 2022: [Exclude]
  • September 14, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Continue ]
June, 2022
  • June 16, 2022: [Notice of Error]
  • June 16, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 13, 2022: [Probation Order]
February, 2022
  • February 23, 2022: [Statement of Offense]
  • February 23, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • February 23, 2022: [Waiver of Trial by Jury]
  • February 22, 2022: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
  • February 22, 2022: [Referred for PSI Report]
January, 2022
  • January 06, 2022: [Status Conference]
December, 2021
  • December 08, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • December 08, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 07, 2021: [Continue ]
November, 2021
  • November 03, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • November 03, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • November 03, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
October, 2021
  • October 27, 2021: [.Order]
  • October 27, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 25, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.