U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00628-1
  • Case Name: USA v. WEISBECKER
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
November, 2021
  • November 19, 2021: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
  • November 17, 2021: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • November 16, 2021: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • November 14, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 12, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • November 12, 2021: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • November 12, 2021: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • November 12, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 12, 2021: [Exclude]
  • November 12, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • November 10, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 05, 2021: [Rule 5 (c)(3) Documents Received]
  • November 05, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 05, 2021: [.Order]
  • November 02, 2021: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel]
October, 2021
  • October 25, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
  • October 25, 2021: [Arrest - Other District ]
  • October 25, 2021: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.