U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mc-00133
  • Case Name: AMERICAN FEDERATION OF STATE, COUNTY & MUNICIPAL EMPLOYEES, AFL-CIO v. PROJECT VERITAS ACTION FUND et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 15, 2022: [Enforce]
August, 2022
  • August 25, 2022: [Memorandum & Opinion]
  • August 02, 2022: [Reply to opposition to motion]
July, 2022
  • July 21, 2022: [Response to motion]
  • July 08, 2022: [Quash]
June, 2022
  • June 27, 2022: [Status Report]
November, 2021
  • November 12, 2021: [Order on Motion to Quash]
  • November 08, 2021: [Memorandum in opposition to motion]
October, 2021
  • October 27, 2021: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • October 27, 2021: [.Order]
  • October 27, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • October 26, 2021: [Notice of Related Case]
  • October 26, 2021: [Motion to Quash]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.