U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cr-00211-1
  • Case Name: USA v. FADL
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 06, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 01, 2022: [.Order]
  • December 01, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
November, 2022
  • November 22, 2022: [.Order]
  • November 22, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Transcript]
  • September 15, 2022: [.Order]
  • September 15, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • September 14, 2022: [Status Conference]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Redacted Transcript]
  • August 28, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 24, 2022: [Continue ]
November, 2021
  • November 18, 2021: [USCA Case Number]
October, 2021
  • October 27, 2021: [Redacted Document]
  • October 26, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.