U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00634-1
  • Case Name: USA v. SORGENTE
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
November, 2021
  • November 16, 2021: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
  • November 05, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release with Global Positioning System Monitoring]
  • November 05, 2021: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • November 05, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • November 05, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 05, 2021: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • November 05, 2021: [Exclude]
  • November 05, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • November 05, 2021: [Rule 5 (c)(3) Documents Received]
  • November 02, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 02, 2021: [.Order]
  • November 02, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
October, 2021
  • October 27, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 26, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
  • October 26, 2021: [Arrest - Other District ]
  • October 26, 2021: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.