U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00644-1
  • Case Name: USA v. WEIBLING
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 20, 2022: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct ]
  • October 20, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • October 20, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 19, 2022: [Continue ]
  • October 19, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
  • October 19, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
September, 2022
  • September 09, 2022: [Transcript]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 31, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 31, 2022: [Continue ]
July, 2022
  • July 14, 2022: [Statement of Offense]
  • July 14, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 14, 2022: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
  • July 14, 2022: [Referred for PSI Report]
  • July 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Travel ]
  • July 11, 2022: [Travel ]
  • July 01, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 01, 2022: [Status Report]
June, 2022
  • June 06, 2022: [Status Report]
May, 2022
  • May 06, 2022: [Status Report]
April, 2022
  • April 07, 2022: [Status Report]
March, 2022
  • March 07, 2022: [Status Report]
February, 2022
  • February 15, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 07, 2022: [Status Report]
January, 2022
  • January 10, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • January 07, 2022: [Status Report]
November, 2021
  • November 23, 2021: [Status Report]
  • November 05, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 04, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 03, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
October, 2021
  • October 27, 2021: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • October 27, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • October 27, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • October 27, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 27, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • October 27, 2021: [.Order]
  • October 27, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 26, 2021: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.