U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00648-1
  • Case Name: USA v. JOHNSON
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 07, 2022: [Statement of Reasons (DO NOT UNSEAL)]
  • March 07, 2022: [Judgment]
  • March 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Access]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Access]
  • February 25, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • February 24, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 23, 2022: [Order on Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal]
  • February 21, 2022: [Downward Departure]
  • February 18, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • February 15, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 10, 2022: [Order on Motion for Hearing ]
  • February 10, 2022: [Hearing ]
December, 2021
  • December 13, 2021: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • November 22, 2021: [Statement of Offense]
  • November 22, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • November 22, 2021: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
  • November 22, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • November 22, 2021: [Referred for PSI Report]
  • November 22, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 08, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 04, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 27, 2021: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.