U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00645-1
  • Case Name: USA v. CREEK
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 23, 2022: [Transcript]
May, 2022
  • May 04, 2022: [Statement of Reasons (DO NOT UNSEAL)]
  • May 04, 2022: [Judgment]
  • May 02, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 02, 2022: [Sentencing]
April, 2022
  • April 30, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 29, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • April 28, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • April 28, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 26, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • April 25, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
March, 2022
  • March 03, 2022: [Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance by Assistant U.S. Attorney]
  • March 01, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
February, 2022
  • February 10, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 07, 2022: [Rule 5 (c)(3) Documents Received]
January, 2022
  • January 28, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • January 24, 2022: [Continue ]
  • January 24, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • January 24, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • January 24, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 05, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • January 05, 2022: [Continue ]
December, 2021
  • December 20, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 20, 2021: [.Order]
  • December 20, 2021: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • December 17, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 14, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 01, 2021: [Statement of Offense]
  • December 01, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • December 01, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • December 01, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • December 01, 2021: [Referred for PSI Report]
  • December 01, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • November 30, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • November 30, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 24, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • November 24, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 05, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
October, 2021
  • October 28, 2021: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.