U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00643-1
  • Case Name: USA v. RUTLEDGE et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Waiver of Trial by Jury]
  • October 31, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 31, 2022: [Statement of Offense]
  • October 31, 2022: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
  • October 31, 2022: [Referred for PSI Report]
  • October 31, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • October 31, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 31, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 28, 2022: [Waiver of Trial by Jury]
  • October 28, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 28, 2022: [Statement of Offense]
  • October 28, 2022: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
  • October 28, 2022: [Referred for PSI Report]
  • October 28, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 28, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 25, 2022: [Waiver of Trial by Jury]
  • October 25, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 25, 2022: [Statement of Offense]
  • October 25, 2022: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
  • October 25, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 25, 2022: [Referred for PSI Report]
  • October 25, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 25, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • October 25, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 17, 2022: [Continue ]
  • October 14, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [.Order]
  • August 12, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 10, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 09, 2022: [Continue ]
  • August 04, 2022: [.Order]
June, 2022
  • June 22, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 21, 2022: [Continue ]
  • June 08, 2022: [Information - Felony]
May, 2022
  • May 11, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 09, 2022: [Exclude]
  • May 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • May 06, 2022: [Continue ]
March, 2022
  • March 04, 2022: [Information - Felony]
February, 2022
  • February 23, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 22, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • February 11, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
December, 2021
  • December 21, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • December 21, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 21, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • December 21, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 21, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 21, 2021: [Order on Motion for Disclosure ]
  • December 21, 2021: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • December 21, 2021: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • December 20, 2021: [Discovery]
  • December 20, 2021: [Protective Order ]
  • December 17, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 16, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • December 16, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • December 16, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 08, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • December 07, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
November, 2021
  • November 18, 2021: [Order on Motion for Disclosure ]
  • November 18, 2021: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • November 09, 2021: [.Order]
  • November 09, 2021: [Disclosure ]
  • November 09, 2021: [Protective Order ]
  • November 01, 2021: [.Order]
October, 2021
  • October 28, 2021: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.