U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00646-1
  • Case Name: USA v. SUN et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • October 10, 2024: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • October 10, 2024: [USCA Case Number]
  • October 07, 2024: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • October 04, 2024: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • October 04, 2024: [Statement of Reasons (DO NOT UNSEAL)]
  • October 04, 2024: [Judgment]
  • October 03, 2024: [Sentencing]
December, 2022
  • December 19, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • December 07, 2022: [Continue ]
  • December 07, 2022: [Exclude]
October, 2022
  • October 24, 2022: [.Order]
September, 2022
  • September 22, 2022: [Exclude]
  • September 14, 2022: [Continue ]
  • September 14, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 13, 2022: [Continue ]
July, 2022
  • July 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • July 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • July 06, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 05, 2022: [Exclude]
  • July 05, 2022: [Continue ]
February, 2022
  • February 25, 2022: [Status Conference]
November, 2021
  • November 10, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • November 10, 2021: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • November 10, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • November 10, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 05, 2021: [Exclude]
  • November 02, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 29, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • October 28, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.