U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00638-1
  • Case Name: USA v. FONTICOBA
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 07, 2024: [Reply to Opposition]
December, 2022
  • December 20, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
October, 2022
  • October 05, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
September, 2022
  • September 12, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
August, 2022
  • August 10, 2022: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • August 02, 2022: [Dismiss Count(s)]
May, 2022
  • May 09, 2022: [Continue ]
February, 2022
  • February 10, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 07, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
November, 2021
  • November 08, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • November 08, 2021: [Order on Motion for Disclosure ]
  • November 08, 2021: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • November 08, 2021: [Disclosure ]
  • November 08, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 08, 2021: [Protective Order ]
  • November 08, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 08, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 05, 2021: [Continue ]
  • November 02, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 02, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 02, 2021: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • November 02, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • November 02, 2021: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • November 02, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • November 02, 2021: [Exclude]
  • November 02, 2021: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • November 01, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 01, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 29, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 28, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
  • October 28, 2021: [Rule 5 (c)(3) Documents Received]
  • October 28, 2021: [Arrest - Other District ]
  • October 27, 2021: [.Order]
  • October 27, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.