U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00647-1
  • Case Name: USA v. BURLEW
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 02, 2024: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
September, 2024
  • September 26, 2024: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • September 26, 2024: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • September 26, 2024: [Withdraw Document]
  • September 26, 2024: [Release from Custody ]
December, 2022
  • December 19, 2022: [Competency Hearing]
November, 2022
  • November 11, 2022: [Status Report]
September, 2022
  • September 21, 2022: [.Order]
  • September 20, 2022: [Status Report]
  • September 06, 2022: [Response to motion]
  • September 01, 2022: [Order of Competency to Stand Trial ]
August, 2022
  • August 16, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel]
July, 2022
  • July 05, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel]
April, 2022
  • April 18, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel]
  • April 15, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
March, 2022
  • March 25, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 24, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • March 24, 2022: [Indictment]
February, 2022
  • February 11, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 04, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 03, 2022: [Status Report]
December, 2021
  • December 14, 2021: [Rule 5 (c)(3) Documents Received]
  • December 13, 2021: [Order on Motion for Disclosure ]
  • December 13, 2021: [Disclosure ]
November, 2021
  • November 09, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 05, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • November 05, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • November 05, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • November 05, 2021: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • November 05, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • November 05, 2021: [.Order]
  • November 05, 2021: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • November 05, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 04, 2021: [Protective Order ]
  • November 04, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 28, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.